NY S02849 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-12)
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a health care plan from making prescription drug formulary changes during a contract year.
Title
Prohibits a health care plan from making prescription drug formulary changes during a contract year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-23 | Senate | tabled |
2019-12-23 | Senate | vetoed memo.245 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.462 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2849A |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-06 | Senate | amended on third reading 2969a |
2019-06-05 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.69 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | rules report cal.69 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-04 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-28 | Senate | referred to insurance |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2969A |
2019-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2849A |
2019-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.462 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A02969 (Same As) 2019-12-23 - tabled