NY A02969 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-8)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits a health care plan from making prescription drug formulary changes during a contract year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits a health care plan from making prescription drug formulary changes during a contract year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.462
2019-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2849A
2019-06-17SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-17Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-17Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-06Assemblyamended on third reading 2969a
2019-06-05Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.69
2019-06-05Assemblyrules report cal.69
2019-06-05Assemblyreported
2019-06-04Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-05-21Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-28Assemblyreferred to insurance

Same As/Similar To

S02849 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2969A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02969&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02969&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02969
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02969&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02969A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02969&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02969&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02969&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02969&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback