NY S02803 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5707
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5707
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to bona fide work not being considered a parole violation.
Title
Relates to bona fide work not being considered a parole violation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5707 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.606 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A05707 (Same As) 2021-10-22 - signed chap.487