NY S02724 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-09 - PRINT NUMBER 2724A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-09 - PRINT NUMBER 2724A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the veterans of foreign wars service officers fund and provides for gifts made to such fund on an individual's personal income tax return.
Title
Establishes the veterans of foreign wars service officers fund and provides for gifts made to such fund on an individual's personal income tax return.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2724A |
2012-01-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2011-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04269 (Same As) 2012-01-25 - print number 4269a