NY S02557 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - SIGNED CHAP.87
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - SIGNED CHAP.87
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the definition of electric plant; provides for employees of the Indian Point Nuclear Power Plant to be paid a certain wage in certain situations; repeals certain provisions relating to the Indian Point Nuclear Power Plant.
Title
Expands the definition of electric plant; provides for employees of the Indian Point Nuclear Power Plant to be paid a certain wage in certain situations; repeals certain provisions relating to the Indian Point Nuclear Power Plant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 119 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.87 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.125 |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | substituted for a2684 |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2021-02-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.141 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A02684 (Same As) 2021-03-08 - substituted by s2557