NY A02684 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - substituted by s2557
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - substituted by s2557
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the definition of electric plant; provides for employees of the Indian Point Nuclear Power Plant to be paid a certain wage in certain situations; repeals certain provisions relating to the Indian Point Nuclear Power Plant.
Title
Expands the definition of electric plant; provides for employees of the Indian Point Nuclear Power Plant to be paid a certain wage in certain situations; repeals certain provisions relating to the Indian Point Nuclear Power Plant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | Assembly | substituted by s2557 |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.125 |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-20 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S02557 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - SIGNED CHAP.87