NY S02518 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to sexual abuse in the first degree where a person is incapable of consent while a passenger on public transportation and the contact was intentional and with the sole purpose of sexual gratification.
Title
Relates to sexual abuse in the first degree where a person is incapable of consent while a passenger on public transportation and the contact was intentional and with the sole purpose of sexual gratification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2014-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1597 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2518B |
2014-06-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2013-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2518A |
2013-06-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2013-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A02093 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - print number 2093b