NY A02093 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-16 - print number 2093b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-16 - print number 2093b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to sexual abuse in the first degree where a person is incapable of consent while a passenger on public transportation and the contact was intentional and with the sole purpose of sexual gratification.
Title
Relates to sexual abuse in the first degree where a person is incapable of consent while a passenger on public transportation and the contact was intentional and with the sole purpose of sexual gratification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Assembly | print number 2093b |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | print number 2093a |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S02518 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - referred to codes