NY S02504 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - THRU LINE VETO MEMO.36
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - THRU LINE VETO MEMO.36
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes appropriations for the support of government - Capital Projects Budget.
Title
Makes appropriations for the support of government - Capital Projects Budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 114 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 114 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | THRU LINE VETO MEMO.36 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | LINE VETO MEMO.24 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.54 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | message of necessity - 3 day message |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.54 |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | substituted for a3004d |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-04-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-04-06 | Senate | MESSAGE OF NECESSITY - 3 DAY MESSAGE |
2021-04-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.649 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2504D |
2021-04-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2021-04-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2504C |
2021-04-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2021-03-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2504B |
2021-03-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2021-02-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2504A |
2021-02-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2021-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A03004 (Same As) 2021-04-06 - substituted by s2504d