NY A03004 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - substituted by s2504d
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes appropriations for the support of government - Capital Projects Budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes appropriations for the support of government - Capital Projects Budget.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06Assemblysubstituted by s2504d
2021-04-06Assemblyrules report cal.54
2021-04-06Assemblyreported
2021-04-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-04-06Assemblyprint number 3004d
2021-04-06Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2021-04-06Assemblyprint number 3004c
2021-04-06Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2021-03-13Assemblyprint number 3004b
2021-03-13Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2021-02-24Assemblyprint number 3004a
2021-02-24Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2021-01-20Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S02504 (Same As) 2021-04-07 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A3004
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03004&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03004A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03004&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03004B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03004&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03004D
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03004&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03004&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1

Bill Comments

feedback