NY S02464 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-12 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-12 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires elementary schools to report the results of English/language arts and mathematics assessments to the parents of pupils by the last day of classes for the school year.
Title
Requires elementary schools to report the results of English/language arts and mathematics assessments to the parents of pupils by the last day of classes for the school year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-12 | Assembly | referred to education |
2014-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1316 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-05-29 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO EDUCATION |
2014-05-22 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO NEW YORK CITY EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2013-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.966 |
2013-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05271 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to education