NY S02412 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - PRINT NUMBER 2412B
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - PRINT NUMBER 2412B
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing small business tax-deferred savings accounts.
Title
Relates to authorizing small business tax-deferred savings accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2412B |
2020-03-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2020-02-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2412A |
2020-01-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2019-02-27 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A07332 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - print number 7332b