NY S02351 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Declares Asian Lunar New Year a public holiday.
Title
Declares Asian Lunar New Year a public holiday.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2023-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2351A |
2023-06-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2023-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A01275 (Same As) 2023-06-23 - enacting clause stricken