NY A01275 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-2)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-23 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Declares Asian Lunar New Year a public holiday.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Declares Asian Lunar New Year a public holiday.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-23Assemblyenacting clause stricken
2023-06-08Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-06-06Assemblyreference changed to ways and means
2023-06-05Assemblyprint number 1275a
2023-06-05Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to governmental operations
2023-01-13Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S02351 (Same As) 2023-06-05 - PRINT NUMBER 2351A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback