NY S02279 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A43C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A43C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a plain and conspicuous printed list of all ingredients listed in order of predominance on diapers sold in the state; imposes a civil penalty of one percent of the manufacturer's total annual in-state sales not to exceed one thousand dollars per package or box on the manufacturer.
Title
Requires a plain and conspicuous printed list of all ingredients listed in order of predominance on diapers sold in the state; imposes a civil penalty of one percent of the manufacturer's total annual in-state sales not to exceed one thousand dollars per package or box on the manufacturer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A43C |
2024-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1825 |
2024-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-30 | Senate | AMENDED BY RESTORING TO PREVIOUS PRINT 2279C |
2024-02-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2279D |
2024-02-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2023-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1665 |
2023-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2279C |
2023-06-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2023-05-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2279B |
2023-05-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2023-03-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2279A |
2023-03-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2023-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A00043 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY