NY S02268 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-14 - SIGNED CHAP.424
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-14 - SIGNED CHAP.424
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes an insured to designate a third party to receive cancellation notification.
Title
Authorizes an insured to designate a third party to receive cancellation notification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-14 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.424 |
2016-11-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.204 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a10269 |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2016-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1423 |
2016-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2015-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1349 |
2015-06-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07182 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to insurance
A10269 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - substituted by s2268
A10269 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - substituted by s2268