NY S02267 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to scheduling an examination for any position or positions in the classified services that provides child protection services.
Title
Relates to scheduling an examination for any position or positions in the classified services that provides child protection services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-03-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.445 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2015-06-25 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1445 |
2015-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07454 (Same As) 2015-11-20 - enacting clause stricken