NY S02263 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the eviction of tenants for using medical marihuana for a certified medical use.
Title
Prohibits the eviction of tenants for using medical marihuana for a certified medical use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.250 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2023-03-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-02-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.228 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07159 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to housing