NY S02099 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-16 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-16 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes bay constables appointed by a county, city, town or village within the definition of peace officers.
Title
Includes bay constables appointed by a county, city, town or village within the definition of peace officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2016-05-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.472 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2015-01-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A03024 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to codes