NY S02094 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Southampton, county of Suffolk, to enact by local law a homestead exemption; provides that such exemption shall not exceed $50,000 in full assessed value.
Title
Authorizes the town of Southampton, county of Suffolk, to enact by local law a homestead exemption; provides that such exemption shall not exceed $50,000 in full assessed value.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.479 |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | substituted for a3872a |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2024-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-04 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1684 |
2024-06-04 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2094A |
2024-05-17 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2023-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A03872 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - substituted by s2094a