NY S02040 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to public notice before approval of utility transmission facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to public notice before approval of utility transmission facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-02-28Assemblypassed assembly
2019-02-28Assemblyordered to third reading cal.65
2019-02-28Assemblysubstituted for a4311
2019-02-11Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions
2019-02-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-02-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-01-22SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.42
2019-01-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A04311 (Same As) 2019-02-28 - substituted by s2040

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback