NY S02002 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the length of the term of office to four years for members of the legislature.
Title
Increases the length of the term of office to four years for members of the legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-01-28 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-03-04 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-02-09 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2021-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |