NY S01995 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-09 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-09 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends supplementary medical insurance benefits reimbursement amount to include additional charges other than the premium charge; defines health benefit plan of supplementary medical insurance benefits.
Title
Amends supplementary medical insurance benefits reimbursement amount to include additional charges other than the premium charge; defines health benefit plan of supplementary medical insurance benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2016-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-06-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1385 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1442 |
2015-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-02-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-01-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04190 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to governmental employees