NY S01915 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires mercantile establishments to cease collections upon a court finding of not guilty of larceny in mercantile establishments.
Title
Requires mercantile establishments to cease collections upon a court finding of not guilty of larceny in mercantile establishments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1086 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2023-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A01681 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to judiciary