NY S01887 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the summons with notice in a cause of action for personal injury or wrongful death to include a prayer for general relief.
Title
Requires the summons with notice in a cause of action for personal injury or wrongful death to include a prayer for general relief.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.185 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A07973 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to judiciary