NY S01885 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-04 - SIGNED CHAP.198
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-04 - SIGNED CHAP.198
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits people registered under the sex offender registration act from being a volunteer firefighter; provides that a conviction that requires registration under the sex offender registration act shall result in an immediate disqualification as a member.
Title
Prohibits people registered under the sex offender registration act from being a volunteer firefighter; provides that a conviction that requires registration under the sex offender registration act shall result in an immediate disqualification as a member.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-04 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.198 |
2014-07-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.121 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a2318d |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2014-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1376 |
2014-06-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1885C |
2014-06-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-20 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2013-06-17 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1885B |
2013-06-17 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2013-05-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-05-29 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.805 |
2013-05-29 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-02-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1885A |
2013-02-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A02318 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - substituted by s1885c