NY S01874 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the brownfield opportunity area program.
Title
Relates to the brownfield opportunity area program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2018-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.676 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1874A |
2018-03-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2017-04-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-04-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-02-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.125 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A03505 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to environmental conservation