NY S01804 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.127
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.127
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires gas and electric corporations to provide sixty days' notice to customers whenever there is a service rate or charge increase.
Title
Requires gas and electric corporations to provide sixty days' notice to customers whenever there is a service rate or charge increase.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. Robert Rolison [R] |
Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 107 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-21 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.127 |
2024-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.98 |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | substituted for a4895 |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2024-03-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-03-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-02-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.371 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-03-13 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2023-03-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-02-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.230 |
2023-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04895 (Same As) 2024-05-23 - substituted by s1804