WA HB2348 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Effective date 6/6/2024*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Effective date 6/6/2024*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning county hospital funding.
Title
Concerning county hospital funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Committee on Finance: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House Committee on Local Government: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Committee on Finance: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House Committee on Local Government: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-29 | House | Effective date 6/6/2024*. |
2024-03-29 | House | Chapter 361, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-29 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 59; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-03-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-09 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-05 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-02 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-29 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2024-01-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-26 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 62 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 62 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
84 | 52 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
84 | 52 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |