NY A04895 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - substituted by s1804
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires gas and electric corporations to provide sixty days' notice to customers whenever there is a service rate or charge increase.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires gas and electric corporations to provide sixty days' notice to customers whenever there is a service rate or charge increase.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-23Assemblysubstituted by s1804
2024-05-22Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.98
2024-05-22Assemblyrules report cal.98
2024-05-22Assemblyreported
2024-05-21Assemblyreported referred to rules
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to energy
2023-02-24Assemblyreferred to energy

Same As/Similar To

S01804 (Same As) 2024-06-04 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback