NY S01754 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for NYSTRS retirees to change their retirement plan beneficiary to a spouse at any time either prior to or after retirement.
Title
Allows for NYSTRS retirees to change their retirement plan beneficiary to a spouse at any time either prior to or after retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-03-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.611 |
2021-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |