NY S01754 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-28 - PRINT NUMBER 1754A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-28 - PRINT NUMBER 1754A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that chiropractors may certify disability for handicapped parking and real property tax purposes and be employed by school districts to assist medical inspectors.
Title
Provides that chiropractors may certify disability for handicapped parking and real property tax purposes and be employed by school districts to assist medical inspectors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1754A |
2016-01-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A03342 (Same As) 2016-02-22 - print number 3342a