NY S01754 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides additional notice of the real property tax exemption for senior citizens under section 467 of the real property tax law and requires municipal corporations to permit late filings within 60 days of the statutory deadline from persons previously granted such exemption.
Title
Provides additional notice of the real property tax exemption for senior citizens under section 467 of the real property tax law and requires municipal corporations to permit late filings within 60 days of the statutory deadline from persons previously granted such exemption.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] | Sen. Adriano Espaillat [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Klein [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] |
Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-02-21 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2012-01-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1754A |
2012-01-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2011-03-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2011-02-28 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2011-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A00541 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - held for consideration in ways and means