NY S01624 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to allowing boards of education of every school district to require minors who are five years of age to attend kindergarten.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to allowing boards of education of every school district to require minors who are five years of age to attend kindergarten.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26Assemblyreferred to education
2019-03-26SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-26SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-25SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-20Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-19Senate1ST REPORT CAL.312
2019-01-15SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A07112 (Same As) 2019-04-08 - referred to education

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback