NY A07112 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - SIGNED CHAP.703
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - SIGNED CHAP.703
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing boards of education of every school district to require minors who are five years of age to attend kindergarten.
Title
Relates to allowing boards of education of every school district to require minors who are five years of age to attend kindergarten.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Benedetto [D] | Asm. Philip Ramos [D] | Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] |
Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.703 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-03 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-03 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.431 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | substituted for a7112 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | referred to education |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.312 |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s1624 |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.431 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S01624 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - SIGNED CHAP.703