NJ SJR14 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR109
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR209
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR209
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates third Sunday of November of each year as "World Day of Remembrance for Road Traffic Victims" in NJ.
Title
Designates third Sunday of November of each year as "World Day of Remembrance for Road Traffic Victims" in NJ.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] | Sen. James Holzapfel [R] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Sen. Parker Space [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR109 (Carry Over) 2023-12-21 - Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)
AJR209 (Carry Over) 2023-12-28 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
AJR48 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
AJR209 (Carry Over) 2023-12-28 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
AJR48 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading