NJ AJR209 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future AJR48
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR14

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-28 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Designates third Sunday of November of each year as "World Day of Remembrance for Road Traffic Victims" in NJ.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates third Sunday of November of each year as "World Day of Remembrance for Road Traffic Victims" in NJ.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-12-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-28SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2023-12-21AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (73-0-0)
2023-12-14AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2023-01-10AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee

Same As/Similar To

AJR209 (Carry Over) 2023-12-28 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
AJR209 (Carry Over) 2023-12-28 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
SJR109 (Same As) 2023-12-21 - Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback