NY S01544 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-31 - APPROVAL MEMO.165
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-31 - APPROVAL MEMO.165
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a compensation statement to be filed annually with the public service commission by any public utility corporation or service provider with a gross annual operating revenue of more than one million dollars.
Title
Requires a compensation statement to be filed annually with the public service commission by any public utility corporation or service provider with a gross annual operating revenue of more than one million dollars.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 119 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-31 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.165 |
2021-12-31 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.826 |
2021-12-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.176 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a4403 |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-02-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.254 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1544A |
2021-01-27 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2021-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04403 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - substituted by s1544a