NY S01531 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A114
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A114
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the time state agencies would have to appeal article 78 supreme court judgments against them for violations of freedom of information laws.
Title
Limits the time state agencies would have to appeal article 78 supreme court judgments against them for violations of freedom of information laws.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A114 |
2015-05-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.743 |
2015-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00114 (Same As) 2015-12-11 - tabled