NY A00114 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-11 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-11 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the time state agencies would have to appeal article 78 supreme court judgments against them for violations of freedom of information laws.
Title
Limits the time state agencies would have to appeal article 78 supreme court judgments against them for violations of freedom of information laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-11 | Senate | tabled |
2015-12-11 | Senate | vetoed memo.274 |
2015-11-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1531 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2015-03-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-03-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.50 |
2015-03-03 | Assembly | reported |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01531 (Same As) 2015-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A114