NY S01487 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the average assessed value threshold; relates to the eligibility of J-51 tax abatements to reflect cost of living adjustments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases the average assessed value threshold; relates to the eligibility of J-51 tax abatements to reflect cost of living adjustments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2018-03-26SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1487A
2018-01-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-01-29Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-01-23Senate1ST REPORT CAL.264
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-19Assemblyreferred to real property taxation
2017-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-03-01SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-02-28Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-02-14Senate1ST REPORT CAL.226
2017-01-09SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A01203 (Same As) 2018-03-23 - print number 1203b

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback