NY A01203 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - print number 1203b
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - print number 1203b
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the average assessed value threshold; relates to the eligibility of J-51 tax abatements to reflect cost of living adjustments.
Title
Increases the average assessed value threshold; relates to the eligibility of J-51 tax abatements to reflect cost of living adjustments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Assembly | print number 1203b |
2018-03-23 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | print number 1203a |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S01487 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES