NY S01454 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that an individual shall not become ineligible under the EPIC program due to an increase in social security benefits or a public or private pension where such increase does not exceed the CPI.
Title
Provides that an individual shall not become ineligible under the EPIC program due to an increase in social security benefits or a public or private pension where such increase does not exceed the CPI.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO AGING | |
2009-02-02 | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A6646 (Same As) 2010-06-25 - delivered to senate