NY S01425 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION
Pending: Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION
Pending: Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the council on the arts to establish criteria and guidelines for the establishment of state designated arts and cultural districts.
Title
Directs the council on the arts to establish criteria and guidelines for the establishment of state designated arts and cultural districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Jose Serrano [D] | Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] | Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.125 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03723 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development