NY S01381 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-06 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-06 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires multiple liens on farm property to be paid in chronological order, with the earliest lien being paid off first and the most recent being paid last.
Title
Requires multiple liens on farm property to be paid in chronological order, with the earliest lien being paid off first and the most recent being paid last.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2015-05-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-02-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-02-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.80 |
2015-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A01745 (Same As) 2016-03-01 - enacting clause stricken