NY A01745 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires multiple liens on farm property to be paid in chronological order, with the earliest lien being paid off first and the most recent being paid last.
Title
Requires multiple liens on farm property to be paid in chronological order, with the earliest lien being paid off first and the most recent being paid last.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S01381 (Same As) 2015-05-06 - referred to real property taxation