NY S01364 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Parks, Arts and Sports Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Parks, Arts and Sports Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation to establish a resident curator program for the rehabilitation of state park buildings.
Title
Authorizes the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation to establish a resident curator program for the rehabilitation of state park buildings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2022-03-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.614 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2021-03-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.500 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10669 (Same As) 2022-08-12 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development