NY S01313 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to legalizing, validating, ratifying and confirming a transportation contract of the Cold Spring Harbor central school district.
Title
Relates to legalizing, validating, ratifying and confirming a transportation contract of the Cold Spring Harbor central school district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.959 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-05-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.823 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06088 (Same As) 2017-02-23 - referred to education