NY S01262 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-2)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - SIGNED CHAP.27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to state assessments and teacher evaluations; makes certain provisions permanent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to state assessments and teacher evaluations; makes certain provisions permanent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12AssemblySIGNED CHAP.27
2019-04-10SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-01-23Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-01-23Assemblypassed assembly
2019-01-23Assemblyordered to third reading cal.10
2019-01-23Assemblysubstituted for a783
2019-01-23Assemblyreferred to education
2019-01-23SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-01-23SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-01-22SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.37
2019-01-22SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-01-11SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A00783 (Same As) 2019-01-23 - substituted by s1262

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback