NY S01245 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the appointment of an additional acting village justice by villages.
Title
Authorizes the appointment of an additional acting village justice by villages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2016-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-04-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-04-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.524 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08402 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to local governments